CURRICULUM VITAE:
Date and place of birth: 06 July 1968 Split
Nationality: Croatian
Marital status: single
Education:
Shipbuilding College graduated in 1986
Professional Qualifications and Endorsements:
Yacht-Master up to 500 gt.
UAE certificate
GMDSS STCW Radio Operator's Certificate
Medical First Aid Certificate
Basic Training
Forming a part of the watch in a manned engine room
Personal Profile:
Yacht Experience over 20 years.
12 years experience on Cargo Ship's as a fitter.
10 years sailing experience in dinghy boats and race cruisers.
Qualified scuba diver.
I speak English, German, Italian and Spanish languages
Croatian as mother tongue.
Employment History:
Captain on M/Y All Star 1
June 2023-present
Captain and Ch engineer; M/Y Saffuriya, Peri 37
August 2022~January 2023
Captain and Ch engineer; M/Y Wild Whale Hatteras 112
March 2021 - August 2022
Captain and Ch engeneer; M/ Y ''Miracle 8'' Sunseeker76
June 2020 – January 2021
Captain and Ch engeneer; M/ Y ''Miracle'' Princess21
December 2018 - June 2020
Captain and Ch engeneer; M/ Y ''Conte Alberti'' Elegance 90 Dynasty December 2015- December 2018
Maintenance of the yacht
Captain; Y; M/Y ''Kandu'' Ferretti 620, 19 mtr
19. September 2010 – October 2015
Captain; M/Y ''Petar K'' Broward 98, 30mtr.
15. June 2010 -15. September 2010
M/Y Santa Domenica, San Lorenzo 72, Skipper 22mtr.
01. July 2009 – 30. September 2009
M/Y Code, Sunseeker 92 predator, Skipper 28 mtr.
01. June 2009 – 30. June 2009
M/Y Toni, Fairline Targa 62, Skipper 19 mtr.
15 June 2008 – 15 September 2008
M/Y Anuska, Azimut 58, Skipper 18 mtr.
01 May 2004 – 01 May 2008
Merchant Marine:
1989 – 2002, as a fetter on various type of Ship's